Samons et al v. Bonds et al
Plaintiff: Donna Lee Samons, Tawnya Renee Crouch, Ferrell Dean Baker and Terry Lynn Crouch
Defendant: Mary Carolyn Bonds and Jeff M. Bonds
Case Number: 3:2019cv03093
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. JURY TRIAL set for 11/16/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 14, 2020. (slc)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks: Case Management Hearing held on 2/10/2020. (Paula Barden-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in Fayetteville-Room 509) (slc)
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jeff M. Bonds, Mary Carolyn Bonds. (Miller, Stuart)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 2/10/2020 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/30/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 26, 2019. (slc)
December 20, 2019 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2042403.. (Miller, Stuart)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Jeff M. Bonds, Mary Carolyn Bonds.(lgd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. State Court Summons Issued as to Jeff M. Bonds, Mary Carolyn Bonds. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) Modified on 12/23/2019 (lgd).
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jeff M. Bonds, Mary Carolyn Bonds, filed by Donna Lee Samons, Terry Lynn Crouch, Ferrell Dean Baker, Tawnya Renee Crouch.(lgd)
December 20, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 12/23/2019 (lgd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jeff M. Bonds, Mary Carolyn Bonds. (lgd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boone County Circuit Court, case number 05CV-19-334., filed by Jeff M. Bonds, Mary Carolyn Bonds. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Defendant's Answer, #3 Summons to Jeff Bonds, #4 Summons to Mary Bonds)(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samons et al v. Bonds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Lee Samons
Represented By: Andrew Payne Norwood
Represented By: Justin Christopher Zachary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawnya Renee Crouch
Represented By: Andrew Payne Norwood
Represented By: Justin Christopher Zachary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrell Dean Baker
Represented By: Andrew Payne Norwood
Represented By: Justin Christopher Zachary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Lynn Crouch
Represented By: Andrew Payne Norwood
Represented By: Justin Christopher Zachary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Carolyn Bonds
Represented By: Stuart P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff M. Bonds
Represented By: Stuart P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?