Qualls v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Jonathan C. Qualls
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2020cv03045
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Referring Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. Honorable Mark E. Ford no longer assigned to the case. (hnc)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, Office of Regional Counsel, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Commissioner of SSA for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Spencer, Frederick)
July 31, 2020 Complaint fee received: $ 400, receipt number 5007244. (tg)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The purpose of 28 U.S.C. 1915 is to ensure that indigent litigants have an entre, not a barrier, to the federal courts. In re Williamson, 786 F.2d 1336, 1338 (8th Cir. 1986) (quoting Souder v. McGuire, 516 F.2d 820, 823 (3rd Cir. 1975)). Although a claimant need not be completely destitute to take advantage of the IFP statute, he or she must show that paying the filing fee would result in an undue financial hardship. Williamson, 786 F.2d at 1338. After review of the application it has been determined that Plaintiff has adequate income and assets in the bank to cover the filing fee.. Accordingly, Plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed IFP is DENIED. Plaintiff is directed to tender the filing fee of 400.00. Should Plaintiff fail to comply within the required period of time, his/her complaint will become subject to summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order.( Filing Fee due by 8/14/2020); Motions terminated: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jonathan C. Qualls, #7 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jonathan C. Qualls.. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 15, 2020. (cla)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan C. Qualls. (Spencer, Frederick)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: Plaintiff has indicated that he is married, but has failed to provide any information concerning his spouse's sources of income. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Amended IFP due by 8/3/2020. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 13, 2020. (cla)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Jonathan C. Qualls. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Spencer, Frederick)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 7/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(tg)
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan C. Qualls. (Spencer, Frederick)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Jonathan C. Qualls. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - redacted Notice of Decision - Unfavorable, #3 Exhibit B - redacted Notice of Appeals Council Action)(Spencer, Frederick)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jonathan C. Qualls. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qualls v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan C. Qualls
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?