Alberts v. Tilley
Plaintiff: Christopher Carl Alberts
Defendant: Dr. Absalom Tilley
Case Number: 3:2020cv03047
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case is consolidated with Lead Case 19-3084. All future pleadings will be filed in the lead case. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on August 14, 2020. (src)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Absalom Tilley. (Shroff, Madhav)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Absalom Tilley. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Consolidate)Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(Shroff, Madhav)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) by Absalom Tilley.(Jackson, Benjamin)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Absalom Tilley and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #6 Order Directing Service. (lgd)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Dr. Absalom Tilley and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 20, 2020. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(lgd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Sheriff, Boone County Jail to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Boone County Jail). (lgd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 17, 2020. (lgd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Christopher Carl Alberts. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lgd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Absalom Tilley, filed by Christopher Carl Alberts.(lgd) (lgd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alberts v. Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Carl Alberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Absalom Tilley
Represented By: Benjamin D. Jackson
Represented By: Madhav Shroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?