Haught vs. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Ernie Haught, III
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2020cv03056
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Referring Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. Honorable Mark E. Ford no longer assigned to the case. (hnc)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Commissioner of SSA for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Spencer, Frederick)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on August 19, 2020. (cla)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Ernie Haught, III. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Spencer, Frederick)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 9/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(tg)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ernie Haught, III. (Spencer, Frederick)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Ernie Haught, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Redacted Notice of Decision - Unfavorable, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Appeals Council Action)(Spencer, Frederick)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Ernie Haught, III. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haught vs. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernie Haught, III
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?