Clark v. Ross
Plaintiff: James Brian Clark
Defendant: Sheriff Jim Ross
Case Number: 3:2021cv03009
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #13 Notice of Appeal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 505.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/30/2021 (tg)
April 6, 2021 TEXT ONLY MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by James Brian Clark. (tg)
April 6, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #12 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Dismiss by James Brian Clark. ( ) (tg)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Adopting #7 Report and Recommendations and dismissing case without prejudice; Denying as moot all other pending motions. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 31, 2021. (src)
March 29, 2021 Filing 11 ***PLEASE DISREGARD FILED PREMATURELY***MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for Appeal by James Brian Clark. (lgd) Modified text and to terminate motion on 3/29/2021 (lgd).
March 22, 2021 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff James Brian Clark to #9 Objection to Report and Recommendations. (tg)
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendations by James Brian Clark. (tg)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss State Court Indictment by James Brian Clark. (tg)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by James Brian Clark, #6 MOTION to Compel filed by James Brian Clark, #5 MOTION for Sanctions filed by James Brian Clark, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James Brian Clark. Objections to R&R due by 4/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on March 15, 2021. (tg)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Appearance by James Brian Clark. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(src)
March 11, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Mark E. Ford: #5 MOTION for Sanctions filed by James Brian Clark. Motions referred to Honorable Mark E. Ford.(src)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Sanctions by James Brian Clark. (lgd)
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by James Brian Clark. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(tg)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff James Brian Clark to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (tg)
February 8, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 5.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 3/01/2021 (tg) Modified on 2/9/2021 (tg).
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Furnished. (tg)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by James Brian Clark.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brian Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Jim Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?