Cordial v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Terry Cordial
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 3:2021cv03056
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Cordial. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served ORC 8/9/21)(Young, Kelsey)
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Cordial. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Attorney General 8/2/21)(Young, Kelsey)
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Cordial. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served US Atty 8/2/21)(Young, Kelsey)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Terry Cordial. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Young, Kelsey)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 8/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 magistrate consent form)(lgd)
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit ; granting #3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 26, 2021. (cla)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kelsey Jo Young is now appearing as counsel for the Plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 26, 2021. (cla)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Kelsey Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2431342) by Terry Cordial. (Young, Kelsey)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Terry Cordial. (lgd)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Terry Cordial.(lgd)
July 23, 2021 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorney(s) listed on Complaint #2 is (are) not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas:Kelsey Young. An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (lgd)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Terry Cordial. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cordial v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Cordial
Represented By: Kelsey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?