Johnson v. Woods
Plaintiff: Lisa Rae Johnson
Defendant: Nurse Jodie Lynn Woods
Case Number: 3:2021cv03072
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Please see attached document for complete deadline information. Summary Judgment Motion due by 4/15/2022. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on November 17, 2021. (djm)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) with Jury Demand by Jodie Lynn Woods.(Ah Loy, Alexandra)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy on behalf of Jodie Lynn Woods. (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Jodie Lynn Woods and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #6 Order Directing Service. (lgd) (lgd).
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Jodie Lynn Woods and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on October 13, 2021. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(lgd)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Boone County Jail to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $29.00; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff). (src)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (src)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on October 8, 2021. (src)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Lisa Rae Johnson. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(src)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Jodie Lynn Woods, filed by Lisa Rae Johnson.(src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Rae Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jodie Lynn Woods
Represented By: Alexandra Gabrielle Ah Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?