Finnegan v. Leopard et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Michael Ian Finnegan
Defendant: Kieth Leopard and Boone County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2021cv03080
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS attempted not known. Mail originally sent to Patrick Finnegan at Newton County Jail including 5 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Obey Order-TEXT ONLY. No new address available. New Address due by 1/31/2022. (tg)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY SHOW CAUSE ORDER - FAILURE TO OBEY ORDER. The Court entered an Order directing Plaintiff to to submit a completed in forma pauperis application and an Amended Complaint by December 13, 2021. This Order was not returned as undeliverable. Plaintiff did not respond. Plaintiff is given 21 days to show cause why he failed to obey the Order of the Court. If Plaintiff fails to respond by the deadline, this case shall be subject to dismissal. Show Cause Response due by 1/10/2022. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 20, 2021. (smg)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: completed IFP. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order, ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit an Amended Complaint. ( Amended Complaint and Completed IFP due by 12/13/2021) Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on November 19, 2021. (lgd)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Patrick Michael Ian Finnegan. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lgd)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Boone County Detention Center, Kieth Leopard, filed by Patrick Michael Ian Finnegan.(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finnegan v. Leopard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Michael Ian Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kieth Leopard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boone County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?