Weathereal v. Ross et al
Plaintiff: Sony Weathereal
Defendant: Sheriff J. Ross, Major Jerry Williams, Captain James Lookingbill, Lieutenant Callas and Mellissa Hancock
Case Number: 3:2021cv03088
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Filing 14 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Callas, Mellissa Hancock, James Lookingbill, J. Ross, Jerry Williams and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #5 Amended Complaint, #7 supplement, #13 Order Directing Service. (lgd)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Callas, Mellissa Hancock, James Lookingbill, J. Ross, Jerry Williams and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 14, 2022. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(lgd)
February 14, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Carroll County Detention Center to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $41.53; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Carroll County Detention Center). (lgd)
February 14, 2022 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983); granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983); granting #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 14, 2022. (cpg)
February 11, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Sony Weathereal. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lgd)
February 7, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #8 Order Directing Pleading to be Filed,. Sheriff Ross. (src)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING that a Completed IFP with certificate of account be filed; directing Clerk to mail Sheriff Ross a blank IFP application by certified mail return receipt requested. Completed IFP due by 2/14/2022. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on January 31, 2022. (lgd)
January 31, 2022 CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #8 Order Directing Completed IFP be returned, as to Sheriff J. Ross, Carroll County using Certified Mail Article number 70172680000054175566. (lgd)
January 27, 2022 Filing 7 Supplement to #5 Amended Complaint by Sony Weathereal. (lgd) Modified text on 2/14/2022 (lgd).
January 13, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Sony Weathereal. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lgd)
January 13, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) against James Lookingbill, Jerry Williams, J. Ross, Callas, Mellissa Hancock, filed by Sony Weathereal. Related document: #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Sony Weathereal.(lgd)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: completed IFP with certificate of account. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order, ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed. ( Amended Complaint due by 1/25/2022) Completed IFP due by 1/25/2022. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 28, 2021. (lgd)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Sony Weathereal. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(lgd)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Callas, James Lookingbill, J. Ross, Jerry Williams, filed by Sony Weathereal.(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weathereal v. Ross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Weathereal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff J. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Jerry Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain James Lookingbill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Callas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mellissa Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?