Swik v. Castle, et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Jay Swik
Defendant: Searcy County Jail, Sheriff Kenny Castle, Jim Henry, Devin and Hettie Parker
Case Number: 3:2022cv03075
Filed: December 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2023 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY SHOW CAUSE ORDER - FAILURE TO OBEY ORDER. The Court entered an Order (ECF No. 6) directing Plaintiff to file a completed in forma pauperis application by February 3, 2023. This Order was not returned as undeliverable. Plaintiff did not respond. Plaintiff is given 21 days to show cause why he failed to obey the Order of the Court. If Plaintiff fails to respond by the deadline, this case shall be subject to dismissal. Show Cause Response due by 3/2/2023. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 9, 2023. (smg)
January 13, 2023 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Application. Plaintiff submitted a second in forma pauperis (IFP) application (ECF No. 5) at the Order of the Court. However, he has again failed to have the certification regarding inmate funds held in his name completed for the IFP application. For this reason, the Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank Prisoner IFP Application. Plaintiff is given 21 days from the date of this Order to either have the certificate portion of the IFP application completed by the appropriate detention center official and return the application to the Court for review and filing or pay the 350.00 dollar filing fee and 52.00 dollar administrative fee, a total of 402.00 dollars. This case shall be subject to dismissal for failure to obey an order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to return the completed IFP application or pay the 402.00 dollar filing fee by the deadline. Plaintiff is advised this is his last opportunity to provide the needed certificate. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Completed IFP due by 2/3/2023. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on January 13, 2023. (smg)
January 9, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Joseph Jay Swik. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(tg)
January 9, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) against Kenny Castle, Jim Henry, Devin, Hettie Parker Terminating Searcy County Jail, filed by Joseph Jay Swik. Related document: #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Joseph Jay Swik.(tg)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: IFP Application. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. (Completed IFP due by 1/6/2023, Amended Complaint due by 1/6/2023). Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 16, 2022. (bjb)
December 16, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Joseph Jay Swik. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(bjb)
December 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Searcy County Jail, filed by Joseph Jay Swik.(bjb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swik v. Castle, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Jay Swik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Searcy County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Kenny Castle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hettie Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?