Patel et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Chiragkumar Mahendrabhai Patel and Manishabahen Chiragkumar Patel
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Case Number: 3:2023cv03032
Filed: July 27, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chiragkumar Mahendrabhai Patel, Manishabahen Chiragkumar Patel. Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 7/31/2023, answer due 9/29/2023; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 7/31/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (Casazza, Christopher)
July 28, 2023 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (bjb)
July 28, 2023 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (bjb)
July 28, 2023 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Merrick B. Garland, and U.S. Attorney's Office for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Ur Mendoza Jaddu, #2 Summons as to US Attorney's Office, #3 Summons as to Merrick B. Garland)(Casazza, Christopher)
July 28, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2811587), filed by Chiragkumar Mahendrabhai Patel, Manishabahen Chiragkumar Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Casazza, Christopher)
July 27, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Chiragkumar Mahendrabhai Patel, Manishabahen Chiragkumar Patel. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (bjb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chiragkumar Mahendrabhai Patel
Represented By: Christopher M Casazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manishabahen Chiragkumar Patel
Represented By: Christopher M Casazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?