Westlake v. Holm et al
Plaintiff: Emerson Tron Westlake
Defendant: Officer Tim Holm, Officer Allen Mize, Officer Austin Young and Eureka Springs Police Department
Case Number: 3:2025cv03005
Filed: January 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER adopting #6 Report and Recommendations. The case is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 5, 2025. (bjb)
February 21, 2025 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by Emerson Tron Westlake. (bjb)
February 10, 2025 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint (42:1983) filed by Emerson Tron Westlake. Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2025. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on February 10, 2025. (tmc)
February 10, 2025 Case Presiding Judge Reassigned to Honorable Timothy L. Brooks and Honorable Christy D. Comstock as Referral Judge. Motions referred to Honorable Christy D. Comstock.(tmc)
January 21, 2025 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing ADC to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $11.37; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: AR Board of Corrections, Compliance Division; Department of Correction, Trust Fund & Centralized Banking Office). (bjb)
January 21, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must return the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within twenty-one (21) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 2/11/2025. (bjb)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on January 21, 2025. (bjb) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/22/2025) (tmc).
January 21, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983); MOTION for Service by Emerson Tron Westlake. (bjb)
January 21, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (42:1983) against Eureka Springs Police Department, Tim Holm, Allen Mize, Austin Young, filed by Emerson Tron Westlake.(bjb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westlake v. Holm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emerson Tron Westlake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Tim Holm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Allen Mize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Austin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eureka Springs Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?