USA v. Williams, et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Phillip J Williams, LaShawnda Williams and Arkansas State Land Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2002cv04025
Filed: February 13, 2002
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Hempstead
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court DECREE of Foreclosure that Plaintiff have and recover judgment in rem against the property and not in personam against Defendants Phillip J. Williams and LaShawnda Clark formerly known as LaSwhawnda Williams in the amount of $37,94 0.78, plus interest accruing at a rate of 8.75% per annum from 8/28/2014 to date of judgment, together with interest at the legal rate of.58% per annum pursuant to 28 USC sec. 1961(a) from the date of this judgment until paid, and costs herein laid out and expended in the amount of $5,976.01. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 30, 2016. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(mll)
October 25, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT as to separate defendant Stephanie Williams, in rem only as prayed for within the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 25, 2016. (mfr)
January 22, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint as set forth; and granting 44 Decree of Foreclosure in Rem in amount of $37,940.78 and interest at a rate of 8.75% per annum from August 28, 2014 to date of judgment. Further, if judgment is not paid within ten days, setting forth terms and conditions for judicial sale. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 22, 2016. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service) (mll)
August 6, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND JUDGMENT ON DEFAULT as to separate defendant Willie Clark in rem only as prayed for within the Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 6, 2015. (mll)
January 26, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DEFAULT granting 31 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 26, 2015. (mll)
April 7, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 7, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Williams, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Claude S. Hawkins, Jr.
Represented By: Larry R. McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip J Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaShawnda Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas State Land Commissioner
Represented By: Carol Linville Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?