Burton v. SSA Commissioner

Case Number: 4:2004cv04009
Filed: January 15, 2004
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2007 14 JUDGMENT in accordance with the 13 Memorandum Opinion, the decision of the Commissioner is affirmed and Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 21, 2007. (cc: OH&A) (mfr)
November 21, 2007 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 21, 2007. (cc: OH&A)(mfr)
May 30, 2007 12 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
April 30, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines per 11 Order: Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 5/30/2007. (cap)
April 30, 2007 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion to Reopen Case . Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 4/30/07. (cap)
April 23, 2007 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Catharyn Burton. (Barnette, Charles)
April 19, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SUPPLEMENTAL SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 5/21/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 6/18/2007. (cap)
April 16, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant. Judge Bobby E. Shepherd no longer assigned to the case. (cap)
April 16, 2007 9 MOTION to Reopen Case by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 7, 2005 8 JUDGMENT: by Magistrate Bobby E. Shepherd in accordance with Memorandum Opinion filed today's date, hereby orders the decision of the Commissioner of SSA is reversed and this matter is remanded pursuant to sentence 6, 42 USC sec 405(g) for the consideration of additional evidence consistent with Memorandum Opinion remanding case to U.S. agency (cc: all counsel, Ofc of Hrgs & Appeals) (cap)
January 7, 2005 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION: by Magistrate Bobby E. Shepherd (cc: all counsel) (cap)
April 26, 2004 6 SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL BRIEF by defendant SSA Commissioner (cap)
March 17, 2004 5 SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL BRIEF by plaintiff Catharyn Burton (cap)
March 11, 2004 TRANSCRIPT OF SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEEDINGS filed by defendant SSA Commissioner (cn)
March 11, 2004 4 ANSWER by defendant SSA Commissioner [1-1] (cn)
February 3, 2004 3 Featured Case ORDER by Honorable Harry F. Barnes w/ consent forms A attached, referring case to Magistrate Bobby E. Shepherd (cc: all counsel) (cap)
February 2, 2004 2 RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant SSA Commissioner on 1/26/04, on US Atty on 1/21/04 and Atty Gen on 1/20/04 (cap)
January 15, 2004 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished to parties. (cap)
January 15, 2004 FILING FEE PAID: on 1/15/04 in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 58683. (cap)
January 15, 2004 1 COMPLAINT ( 3 summons(es) issued and returned to atty f/svc ) (referred to Magistrate Bobby E. Shepherd ) (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. SSA Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?