Bourgeois v. Vanderbilt et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv04061
Filed: July 27, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2011 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 177 USCA Order, finding that at the time Plaintiff commenced this action, she was a citizen of Louisiana and Harrah's Bossier City Investment Company, LLC was a citizen of both Delaware and Nevada. None of the other separate defendan ts in this action were citizens of Louisiana. Thus, the Court finds that diversity jurisdiction existed as of the date Plaintiff filed her complaint. Further, directing the clerk to send a certified copy of this order to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on April 5, 2011. (cap)
March 22, 2010 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 164 Motion to Dismiss; all claims by plaintiff and Intervenor against defendant Douglas Vanderbilt are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; plaintiff has not been made whole in this action, and she has reserved her right to pursue claims in workers compensation to the extent permitted by law; Intervenor National Interstate Insurance Company has also reserved its right to pursue recovery of the full amount of itssubrogation claims to the extent permitted by law. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 22, 2010. (cnn)
November 24, 2009 161 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 152 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. Defendant Southern Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company terminated. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on November 24, 2009. (cap)
July 28, 2009 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 104 Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiff's claims against separate defendant Harrah's Shreveport/Bossier City Holding Company, LLC are dismissed with prejudice. Defendant Harrah's Shreveport/Bossier City Holding Company, LLC terminated. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on July 28, 2009. (cap)
February 6, 2008 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party National Interstate Insurance Company is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on February 6, 2008. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bourgeois v. Vanderbilt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?