Wilkinson v. Phillips

Plaintiff: Todd D. Wilkinson
Defendant: Louise Phillips
Case Number: 4:2007cv04098
Filed: October 24, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Hempstead
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT for the reasons stated in the memorandum opinion of this date, the Court finds that the Plaintiff recover nothing and that the complaint should be and hereby is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 17, 2009. (lw)
October 17, 2008 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion for Reconsideration re 26 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 17, 2008. (cnn)
October 8, 2008 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting as to Plaintiff's official capacity claims and denying as to Plaintiff's individual capacity claims. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 8, 2008. (cap) Modified on 10/8/2008 to edit text (cap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkinson v. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd D. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?