Trusley v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Debra L. Trusley
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2008cv04020
Filed: March 4, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits Office
County: Sevier
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 15 Report and Recommendations, granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Debra L. Trusley. The Court hereby awards attorney fees in the amount of $3,836.25 pursuant to the EAJA, 28 U.S.C. § 2412. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on July 20, 2009. (cap)
June 19, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Debra L. Trusley. Objections to R&R due by 7/9/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 19, 2009. (dmc)
March 24, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT/ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 10 ; REMANDING CASE TO SSA for further development of the record. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 24, 2009. (cc: R/R and Judgment to OHA)(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trusley v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra L. Trusley
Represented By: David Roscoe Trussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?