Lee v. Miller County, Arkansas et al

Plaintiff: Russell Lee
Defendant: Miller County, Arkansas, Miller County Jail, Rambo, Janice Nicholson and Dolly Simmons
Case Number: 4:2008cv04102
Filed: October 23, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Miller
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 71 Report and Recommendations, and dismissing case and all claims against defendants based on plaintiff's repeated failure to obey court orders and failure to prosecute this action. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 23, 2010. (cap)
January 22, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint and 7 Amended Complaint, filed by Russell Lee, recommending case be dismissed based on Plaintiff's failure to obey the order of the court and his failure to prosecute this action. Objections to R&R due by 2/8/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 22, 2010. (cap)
December 17, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Janice Nicholson, Bayless, Dolly Simmons, Miller County, Arkansas, Rambo, Don Thornell. Plaintiff is directed to return the attached notice by 1/11/10. If Plaintiff fails to return the notice, this case will be subject to summary dismissal for failure to obey the order of this court and failure to prosecute this action. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 17, 2009. (lw)
June 26, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 59 Report and Recommendations, and granting 47 Motion to Amend, which is construed as a Motion to Dismiss. All claims against Warden Neff and Major G. Turner are dismissed. Warden Neff and Major G. Turner terminated as defendants. This case is referred back to Magistrate Judge Bryant for a report and recommendation on the remaining defendants. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 26, 2009. (cap)
June 1, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 47 MOTION to Amend/Correct 7 Amended Complaint filed by Russell Lee, recommending that the motion to amend be construed to be a motion to dismiss, that the motion be granted and that all claims against Major Turner and Warden Neff be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 6/18/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 1, 2009. (cap)
May 1, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Russell Lee re 42 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Russell Lee. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on May 1, 2009. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Miller County, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rambo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolly Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?