Wilson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Wanda Wilson
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2008cv04103
Filed: October 27, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 18 Motion for Attorney Fees, awarding Plaintiff attorney's fees under EAJA in the amount of $3,468.40. This amount should be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past due benefits which plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Further, any EAJA award by this Court should be made payable to plaintiff and not counsel. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 18, 2012. (cap)
May 24, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 16 Motion for Final Judgment, AFFIRMING THE FAVORABLE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER and Plaintiffs case is dismissed. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 24, 2012. (cap)
November 12, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING CASE TO Commissioner of Social Security for further consideration pursuant to sentence six of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 12, 2009. (copy of Memorandum Opinion and Order furnished to OHA)(cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Wilson
Represented By: Greg R. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?