Valdez v. Miller County, Arkansas et al

Plaintiff: Paul Valdez
Defendant: Miller County, Arkansas, Miller County Jail, Rambo, Janice Nicholson and John Doe Correctional Officers Working on November 19, 2008
Case Number: 4:2008cv04124
Filed: December 17, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 32 Report and Recommendations, dismissing case for Plaintiff's failure to keep the Court informed of his current address and for his failure to prosecute this case. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on October 20, 2009. (cap)
October 1, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Paul Valdez be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 10/19/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 1, 2009. (cap)
September 2, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 10 Answer to Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Nurse Joni, Ronald Stoval and Sheriff Rambo constitutes an answer on behalf of Miller County. Further, the clerk should note on the docket sheet that Miller County is represented by the same counsel as Sheriff Rambo. Attorney C. Burt Newell and Ralph C. Ohm added for Miller County, Arkansas. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 2, 2009. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valdez v. Miller County, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rambo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Correctional Officers Working on November 19, 2008
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?