Montgomery v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Timika Montgomery
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2009cv04001
Filed: January 15, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion on Attorney Fees in favor of Timika Montgomery in the amount of $2376.00 as set forth. This amount should be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past due benefits which plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on March 22, 2012. (mfr)
December 22, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT affirming the favorable decision of the Commissioner and dismisses Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on December 22, 2011. (lw)
June 17, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on June 17, 2010. (cnn)
February 18, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting 13 Motion to Remand and REMANDING CASE TO Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with the opinion, pursuant to sentence six of 42 U.S.C. §405(g). Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on February 18, 2010. (copy of Memorandum Opinion and Judgment furnished to OHA)(cap)
June 24, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to Remand. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 24, 2009. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timika Montgomery
Represented By: Greg R. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?