Wheat v. Miller County Jail et al
Plaintiff: James David Wheat
Defendant: Miller County Jail, Texarkana, City of, Jones, Hogan and Doug Arnold
Case Number: 4:2009cv04036
Filed: April 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 74 Report and Recommendations, granting 73 Motion to Dismiss filed by Janice Nicholson, Doug Arnold, James David Wheat, Linda Rambo, and Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Parties settled. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on July 7, 2011. (cap)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 40 Report and Recommendations, dismissing claims against defendant Corporal Hogan without prejudice. Corporal Hogan terminated. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 5, 2010. (cap)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by James David Wheat, recommending claims against Corporal Hogan be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 2/22/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 5, 2010. (cap)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 23 claims against Deputy Jones are dismissed. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on October 23, 2009. (cnn)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 18 Order re Suggestion of Death, recommending Deputy Jones be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 10/8/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 21, 2009. (cap)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheat v. Miller County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James David Wheat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texarkana, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?