Duren v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Lisa Duren
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2009cv04091
Filed: August 25, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Little River
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion for Attorney Fees and awarding Plaintiff attorney's fees in the amount of $1,584.00 pursuant to the EAJA, 28 U.S.C. § 2412. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 4, 2011. (cap)
September 13, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 11 MOTION for Judgment filed by Lisa Duren, affirming the favorable decision of the Commissioner and Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 13, 2011. (cap)
October 30, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting 7 Motion to Remand and REMANDING CASE for further consideration pursuant to Sentence Six of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 30, 2009. (cap) (Copy of Memorandum Opinion and Judgment sent to Office of Hearings & Appeals) Modified on 11/2/2009 to add text (cap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duren v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Duren
Represented By: Greg R. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?