Collins v. Turner et al

Plaintiff: J.C. Otis Collins
Defendant: Gary Turner, Stewart and Jail Doctor
Case Number: 4:2010cv04004
Filed: January 20, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 70 Report and Recommendations; granting 64 Motion to Dismiss Party and Plaintiff's claims against Dr. Clay Nash are dismissed without prejudice ; granting 68 Motion to Dismiss Party and Plaintiff's claims against Major Gary Turner are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed in its entirety. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 26, 2012. (cap)
January 30, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in whole re 57 Report and Recommendations, with the exception of the language that states Defendant "does not dispute that Plaintiff's back and leg pain constituted an objectively serious medical need." Plaintiff therefore retains the burden of proof on both elements of his deliberate indifference claim concerning back and knee pain; granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 30, 2012. (cap)
March 16, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT adopting Report and Recommendations re 30 Report and Recommendations; granting 29 Motion to Dismiss Party Gina Stewart. Party Gina Stewart Terminated. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on March 16, 2011. (cap)
February 17, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 27 Report and Recommendations, and denying 14 Motion to Dismiss filed by Gary Turner. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on February 17, 2011. (cap) Modified on 2/17/2011 to edit text (cap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.C. Otis Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jail Doctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?