Sorrells v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: James Sorrells
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2010cv04016
Filed: February 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Hempstead
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 19 Report and Recommendations, granting 16 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by James Sorrells. Plaintiff awarded attorney fees in the amount of $5,985.75 under EAJA. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on November 30, 2010. (cap)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees for David R. Trussell, Attorney, filed by James Sorrells. Objections to R&R due by 11/29/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 10, 2010. (cap)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in toto for 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 Unopposed MOTION to Remand filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Granting 12 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Reverse and Remand. This matter is reversed and remanded to the Social Security Administration for further administrative review pursuant to Sentence Four. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on August 26, 2010. (dmc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorrells v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sorrells
Represented By: David Roscoe Trussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?