O'Neal v. Regions Financial Corporation

Plaintiff: Jerry Don O'Neal
Defendant: Regions Financial Corporation
Case Number: 4:2010cv04061
Filed: May 6, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT confirming arbitration award. Plaintiff Jerry Don O'Neal shall taking nothing. The arbitration award is in full settlement of all claims that were submitted to arbitration. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. 14) is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 31, 2012. (cap)
January 3, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 24 Report and Recommendations, denying as moot 17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on January 3, 2011. (cap)
December 6, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Regions Bank, recommending motion be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 12/23/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 6, 2010. (cap)
November 30, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 20 Report and Recommendations, denying as moot 3 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 6 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on November 30, 2010. (cap)
November 10, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Regions Financial Corporation, 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Regions Financial Corporation, recommending both motions be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 11/29/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 10, 2010. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neal v. Regions Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Don O'Neal
Represented By: David P. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?