Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America v. Scoggins et al

Plaintiff: Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America
Defendant: Jerry W Scoggins, Jr. and Bronson S Scoggins
Case Number: 4:2010cv04068
Filed: May 26, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT adopting REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 22 Report and Recommendations, granting 12 Motion for Default Judgment as to Bronson S. Scoggins. Plaintiff Allianz Life Insurance Company of North American is awarded $6,194.80 in attorney fees and costs; $68,805.20 is awarded to separate defendant Jerry W. Scoggins, Jr. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on November 29, 2010. (cap)
November 9, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Bronson S. Scoggins filed by Jerry W Scoggins, Jr., Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America, recommending motion be granted. Objections to R&R due by 11/26/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 9, 2010. (cap)
October 12, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 16 and denying 4 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jerry W Scoggins, Jr.. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on October 12, 2010. (jn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America v. Scoggins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry W Scoggins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bronson S Scoggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?