Hempstead County Hunting Club, Inc. v. Southwestern Electric Power Company et al
Plaintiff: Hempstead County Hunting Club, Inc.
Defendant: Southwestern Electric Power Company, United States Army Corps of Engineers, Jeffrey R Eckstein, United States Department of the Interior, Ken Salazar, United States Fish and Wildlife Service and Rowan W Gould
Case Number: 4:2010cv04098
Filed: July 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Hempstead
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting 245 Motion for Release of Funds. Signed by Honorable Richard G. Kopf on August 10, 2015. (mll)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 243 JUDGMENT that all claims in this action are dismissed with prejudice, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Richard G. Kopf on August 22, 2011. (lw)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re 70 Objection(s) filed by Hempstead County Hunting Club, Inc. striking documents AR007281-85 and AR007297-301 from Supplement to Administrative Record; and directing Corps of Engineers to file brief regarding origin of additional documents by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, September 15, 2010. Signed by Honorable William R. Wilson, Jr on September 10, 2010. (jrs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hempstead County Hunting Club, Inc. v. Southwestern Electric Power Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hempstead County Hunting Club, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick W. Addison, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Electric Power Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey R Eckstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowan W Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?