Dancer v. Haltom et al

Plaintiff: Douglas Dancer
Defendant: Brent Haltom, Carlton Jones, David Easley, Wayne Dowd and Griffin
Case Number: 4:2010cv04118
Filed: August 10, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 17 Report and Recommendations; denying 14 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Douglas Dancer. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on May 31, 2011. (cap)
December 9, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 10 Report and Recommendations, DENYING IFP, directing Clerk to collect $350.00 filing fee, and dismissing complaint. This case is considered a "strike" pursuant to the "three strikes" provision in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g), and the Clerk is directed to place the appropriate flag on this case. Signed by Honorable Harry F. Barnes on December 9, 2010. (cap)
November 16, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Douglas Dancer be denied, and that 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Douglas Dancer be dismissed as it fails to state a claim under Section 1983. Further recommending that this case be considered a strike pursuant to the three strikes provision of in forma pauperis statute. Objections to R&R due by 12/3/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 16, 2010. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dancer v. Haltom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Dancer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Haltom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlton Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?