Kolbek et al v. Twenty First Century Holiness Tabernacle Church, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Desiree Kolbek, Amy Eddy, Jeannette Orlando, Nicole Farr, Summer Hagan and Jamie Rodriguez
Defendant: Twenty First Century Holiness Tabernacle Church, Inc., Gloryland Christian Church, Armful of Help, Tony and Susan Alamo Foundation, Music Square Church, SJ Distributing, Inc., Action Distributors Inc., Advantage Food Group, Jeanne Estates Apartments Inc., Sally Demoulin, Sharon Alamo and Steve Johnson
Case Number: 4:2010cv04124
Filed: August 27, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Pope
Presiding Judge: Harry F. Barnes
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2014 736 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 735 Motion for Order Authorizing the Abuse Protection Qualified Settlement Fund to Acquire, Hold, Retain, and Convey Real Property. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 2, 2014. (mll)
January 31, 2014 727 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 723 Motion for Reconsideration. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 31, 2014. (mll)
January 2, 2014 722 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Memorandum Opinion 715 and Order 716 ; Vacating 716 Order on Summary Judgment Motions 493 , 499 , 515 and 522 ; Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction therefore 717 and 719 Motions to Dismiss are granted; a ll state claims in Fifth Amended Complaint against defendants Tony Alamo, Sharon Alamo, Twenty First Century and Jeanne Estates Apartments, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice; Summary Judgment Motions 493 , 499 , 515 and 522 are all granted and denied in part; Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 2, 2014. (cnn)
December 24, 2013 716 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 493 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting and denying in parts 499 Motion for Summary Judgment; 515 Motion for Summary Judgment; 522 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 24, 2013. (cnn)
December 12, 2013 666 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 665 Motion to Dismiss Party. Plaintiffs' claims against Robert W. Gilmore d/b/a RG & Associates Security are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Party Robert W Gilmore Terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 12, 2013. (mll)
December 11, 2013 664 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 662 Motion to Dismiss. Sanford White and Terri White's cross-claims are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Cross-Defendants Twenty First Century Holiness Tabernacle Church Inc., Gloryland Christian Church, Armful of Help, Tony and Susan Alamo Foundation, Music Square Church, SJ Distributing Inc., Action Distributors Inc., Advantage Food Group, Advantage Sales, Jeanne Estates Apartments, Inc., Robert W. Gilmore d/b/a RG & Associates Security, Sally Demoulin, Sharon Alamo, Tony Alamo a/k/a Bernard Hoffman, Cherry Hill Printing, Inc., Rite Way Roofing Inc., Angela Morales, Tommy Scarcello, Steve Lovelette, and Douglas Brubach terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 11, 2013. (mll)
December 5, 2013 644 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 641 Motion to Dismiss. Advantage Food Group's cross-claims and third party complaint are dismissed without prejudice. Cross-Defendants Twenty First Century Holiness Tabernacle Church Inc., Gloryland Christian Church, Armful of Help, Tony and Susan Alamo Foundation, Music Square Church, SJ Distributing Inc., Action Distributors Inc., Jeanne Estates Apartments, Inc., Robert W. Gilmore d/b/a RG & Associates Security, Sally Demoulin, Sharon Alamo, Steve Johnson, Tony Alamo a/k /a Bernard Hoffman, Cherry Hill Printing, Inc., Rite Way Roofing Inc., Angela Morales, Sanford White, Terri White, and Tommy Scarcello and Third Party Defendants Jennifer Kolbek, Lamont Eddy, Susan Davis, Joseph Orlando, Elenora Orlando, Terry Farr, Lisa Penman, James Rodriguez, Nicole Rodriguez, Dennis Hagan, Robin Hagan, Lee King, Alaina King and Ann Nicholas, Special Administratrix of the Estate of John Kolbek, deceased, terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 5, 2013. (mll)
December 2, 2013 637 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 630 Motion to Dismiss Certain Cross-Claims and Certain Third Party Defendants. Defendants cross-claims and third-party claims against Certain Defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Certain Defendants Cherry Hill Printing, Inc.; Terri White; Sanford White; Douglas Brubach; Steve Lovelette; Sally Demoulin; Tommy Scarcello; Rite Way Roofing; Tony and Susan Alamo Foundation; Music Square Church; Gloryland Christian Church; Armful of Help; Action Distributors, Inc.; Advantage Food Group; Advantage Sales, LLC; Angela Morales; and Robert Gilmore d/b/a RG & Associates Security terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 2, 2013. (mll)
November 25, 2013 621 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 610 Agreed Motion to Dismiss and 615 Motion to Dismiss filed on behalf of all Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs claims against Certain Defendants: Cherry Hill Printing, Inc.; Terri White; Sanford White;Joni Johnson; Steve Johnson; Ron Decker ; Donn Wolf; Douglas Brubach; Steve Lovelette; Sally Demoulin;Tommy Scarcello; Rite Way Roofing; Tony and Susan Alamo Foundation; Music Square Church; Gloryland Christian Church; Armful of Help; Action Distributors, Inc.; Advantage Food Group; Advantage Sales, LLC;and Angela Morales are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Certain Defendants terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 25, 2013. (mfr)
September 24, 2013 608 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 606 Motion for Twelve Person Jury. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 24, 2013. (sh)
August 20, 2013 603 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 454 Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claims of Decker, Wolf, Lovellette and Brubach. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 20, 2013. (mll)
October 31, 2011 222 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 196 Motion to Stay, filed by Sharon Alamo, Armful of Help, Action Distributors Inc., Bernie Lazar Hoffman, Music Square Church, Sally Demoulin, Tony and Susan Alamo Foundation, Twenty First Century Holiness Tabe rnacle Church, Inc., SJ Distributing, Inc., Gloryland Christian Church, denying 199 Motion to Stay filed by Advantage Food Group, denying 197 Motion to Stay filed by Jeanne Estates Apartments Inc.,denying 201 Motion to Stay, filed by Robert W Gilmore, denying 208 Motion to Stay, filed by Steve Johnson as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 31, 2011. (dmc)
June 22, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 46 Motion to Dismiss, denying Motion to Strike, denying Motion for More Definite Statement filed by RG & Associates Security; granting 54 Motion to Amend Complaint filed by Pebbles Rodriguez, Desiree Kolbek, J amie Rodriguez, Summer Hagan, Nicole Farr, Amy Eddy, Jeannette Orlando. Plaintiffs are directed to file their amended complaint within 5 days, and Defendants shall have 10 days from the date of the filing in which to file an answer. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on June 22, 2011. (cap)
June 17, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Granting 66 MOTION for Edward B. Cloutman to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Pebbles Rodriguez, Desiree Kolbek, Jamie Rodriguez, Summer Hagan, Nicole Farr, Amy Eddy, Jeannette Orlando. Edward B. Cloutman is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and to enter his appearance in this matter. Denying 73 as construed as a Motion to Disqalify. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on June 17, 2011. (dmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kolbek et al v. Twenty First Century Holiness Tabernacle Church, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Kolbek
Represented By: William David Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Eddy
Represented By: William David Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannette Orlando
Represented By: William David Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Farr
Represented By: William David Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Hagan
Represented By: William David Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Rodriguez
Represented By: William David Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twenty First Century Holiness Tabernacle Church, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloryland Christian Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armful of Help
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony and Susan Alamo Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Music Square Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SJ Distributing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Distributors Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advantage Food Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Estates Apartments Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Demoulin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Alamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?