American Western Home Insurance Company v. Johnson et al

Plaintiff: American Western Home Insurance Company
Defendant: Steve Johnson, Don Wolf and Cherry Hill Printing, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv04071
Filed: July 22, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Paul K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting in part and denying in part 57 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 23, 2016. (mll)
February 4, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit proof of service as to Steve Johnson and Steve Johnson d/b/a Cherry Hill Printing or show cause why claims against these separate defendants should not be dismissed. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 4, 2016. (mll)
September 15, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; denying 54 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 15, 2015. (mll)
August 14, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 34 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 37 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 39 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 14, 2015. (mll)
September 16, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 16, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Western Home Insurance Company v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Western Home Insurance Company
Represented By: Amber W. Bagley
Represented By: Michael Stephen Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Hill Printing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?