Munn v. Morris et al

Plaintiff: Willie Munn
Defendant: Butch Morris, Jala Tallant, Bryant Chester, La Jana Jones and James Graves
Case Number: 4:2011cv04085
Filed: September 2, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Howard
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2013 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 127 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 16, 2013. (mll)
April 22, 2013 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 104 Report and Recommendations; denying as moot 87 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 22, 2013. (cap)
January 9, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 74 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Summary Judgment as further set forth in this order. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 8, 2013. (cap)
April 13, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis and adopting 49 Report and Recommendations. The Clerk is directed to collect the $455 filing fee pursuant to the terms of the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 13, 2012. (adw)
January 30, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 11 Report and Recommendations, and Plaintiff's claims against La Jana Jones, Bryant Chester and James Graves are dismissed. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 30, 2012. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munn v. Morris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Munn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butch Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jala Tallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Jana Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?