Harris et al v. Texarkana, Arkansas, City of et al

Plaintiff: Laney Harris and Keith Bursey
Defendant: Loyd Green Wrecker Service, Inc., Loyd Green, Texarkana, Arkansas, City of, N. Wayne Smith and Paul Hackelman
Case Number: 4:2012cv04050
Filed: May 4, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part Report and Recommendations re 93 Report and Recommendations; granting 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 17, 2014. (mll)
August 15, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 91 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 15, 2014. (mll)
July 15, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 86 Motion for Reconsideration, Motion to Strike re 84 Order Denying Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 15, 2014. (mll)
April 18, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 44 Report and Recommendations; denying 40 Motion for Clerk to Enter Default; denying 41 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 41 Motion to Set Aside. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 18, 2014. (mll)
April 16, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 30 Report and Recommendations; denying 25 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 25 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 16, 2014. (mll)
February 18, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 MOTION to Vacate. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 18, 2014. (mll)
January 21, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion for Reconsideration re 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Keith Bursey, Laney Harris. Plaintiffs have ten (10) days from the date of this order to file their proposed Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 21, 2014. (mll)
December 19, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reminding Parties the deadline for summary judgment motions is January 14, 2014. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 19, 2013. (mll)
December 5, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 Report and Recommendations; denying 3 Motion for TRO; denying 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 5, 2012. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. Texarkana, Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loyd Green Wrecker Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loyd Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texarkana, Arkansas, City of
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Wayne Smith
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hackelman
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laney Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Bursey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?