Townsend v. Singleton et al

Plaintiff: Jacob James Townsend
Defendant: James Singleton, Johnny Godbolt, Veronica Mauldin, Pierre Summelville, Simeon Aimes and Kevin Mellson
Case Number: 4:2012cv04072
Filed: July 5, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Hempstead
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Jacob James Townsend against Simeon Ames in the amount of $5,001.00 with court costs in the amount of $350.00 and against Pierre Summerville in the amount of $1.00 with court costs in the amount of $350.00. ( Defendants Summerville and Ames shall be held jointly and severally liable for the nominal damage awards and $350.00 court costs.) Plaintiff's claims against Kevin Melson are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 3, 2015. (mll)
March 19, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 53 Motion for Sanctions; denying 56 Motion for Sanctions; granting 58 Motion to Supplement Complaint. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 19, 2015. (mll)
March 6, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 6, 2014. (mll)
February 11, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 11 Report and Recommendations, dismissing official capacity claims against all defendants, and dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's individual capacity claims against James Singleton (Sheriff, Hempstead County, AR), Johnny Godbolt (Jail Administrator) and Veronica Mauldin. James Singleton, Johnny Godbolt and Veronica Mauldin terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 11, 2013. (cap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townsend v. Singleton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob James Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Godbolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierre Summelville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simeon Aimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Mellson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?