Lewis v. Brazell et al

Plaintiff: Don Earl Lewis
Defendant: Marty Brazell and Erica Carowood
Case Number: 4:2012cv04100
Filed: August 22, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2016 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 112 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $1.50 from each Defendant, Stephen Ward and Erica Callwood. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 22, 2016. (mll)
September 28, 2015 110 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Don Earl Lewis against Erica Callwood, Stephen Ward in the amount of $2.00. This Judgment dispenses with all of Plaintiff's remaining claims and cases are hereby closed. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 28, 2015. Associated Cases: 4:12-cv-04100-SOH-BAB, 4:12-cv-04139-SOH-BAB (mll)
August 19, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 72 Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 19, 2015. (mll)
August 4, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Clerk to issue a subpoena to Shane Johnston and forward to Plaintiff's counsel for service. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 4, 2015. (mll)
July 9, 2015 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 81 Application for Disbursement and Request to Expend in Excess of Five Hundred Dollars. Plaintiff's Application for Disbursement of $98.75 is hereby GRANTED and the Court orders that the Clerk of the Court disburse money from the Library Fund in the amount of $98.75 and distribute it to Plaintiff's Counsel, Cory Floyd. Further, the approval of an unknown and unlimited amount for travel and photocopying is hereby DENIED. See Order for Specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 9, 2015. (mll)
March 13, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 50 Report and Recommendations; denying 34 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 13, 2015. (mll)
April 7, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendants Brazell, Callwood and Ward to file motions for summary judgment no later than June 9, 2014. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 7, 2014. (mll)
September 18, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 27 Report and Recommendations, denying 13 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 18, 2013. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Brazell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Earl Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Brazell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Carowood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?