Thomason v. Randall et al

Plaintiff: Scott Thomason
Defendant: American Legacy Firearms, Inc., SWS Engraving, LLC, Steve Randall, Warren Hanson and Steve Faler
Case Number: 4:2012cv04155
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2015 114 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice pursuant to terms of settlement agreement. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 22, 2015. (mll)
January 21, 2015 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 89 Second Motion for Summary Judgment. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 21, 2015. (mll)
January 20, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 89 Second Motion for Summary Judgment. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 20, 2015. (mll)
December 18, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion to Strike. Exhibit 4 to 43 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is stricken from the record. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 18, 2014. (mll) Modified to create link on 12/18/2014. (mll)
November 13, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Motion for Reconsideration. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 13, 2014. (mll)
October 29, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 29, 2014. (mll)
October 28, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 39 Motion for Relief. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 28, 2014. (mll)
July 11, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 26 Motion for Sanctions. Hearing set for July 15, 2015 is cancelled. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 11, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomason v. Randall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Legacy Firearms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWS Engraving, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Faler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Thomason
Represented By: Brandon T. Eckhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?