Hamilton v. Singleton et al

Plaintiff: Ted Hamilton
Defendant: James Singleton, Joan McClean, Johnny Godbolt and Stephen Glover
Case Number: 4:2013cv04038
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Hempstead
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2016 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 163 Motion for Transcript at Government Expense. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 3, 2016. (mll)
March 2, 2016 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 141 Motion for New Trial; denying 144 Motion for Reconsideration; denying as moot 161 Motion for Ruling; denying as moot 162 Motion for Consideration; denying as moot 164 Motion for Ruling. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 2, 2016. (mll)
October 21, 2015 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 140 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jonathan William Beck withdrawn. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove his name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 21, 2015. (mll)
September 30, 2015 137 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with prejudice with no award of damages. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 30, 2015. (mll)
May 28, 2015 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 97 Motion for Writ; granting 97 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. (See Order for specifics) Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 28, 2015. (mll)
May 14, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 95 Motion for Release of Funds for Deposition Expenses. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 14, 2015. (mll)
April 14, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 82 Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing; denying 85 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration; denying 86 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; denying 87 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 14, 2015. (mll)
March 5, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 58 Second Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 78 Motion for Hearing; denying 79 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 5, 2015. (mll)
April 29, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 66 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Further, the Clerk is directed to collect the $505 filing fee pursuant to the terms of the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 29, 2014. (mll)
March 28, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 38 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Joan McClean, Stephen Glover and Johnny Godbolt terminated. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 28, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Singleton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Singleton
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan McClean
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Godbolt
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Glover
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?