Driver et al v. D. Mosley Trucking, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lois Driver, Robert Driver, Keith Dedmon and Sean Kearney
Defendant: D. Mosley Trucking, Inc., Ramon R. Colon, Steel Dynamics Inc. and New Millennium Building Systems
Case Number: 4:2013cv04074
Filed: August 5, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Scott
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2015 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 237 Motion to Dismiss. Parties settled, case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to terms of settlement agreement. (See Order for specifics) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 21, 2015. (mll)
April 23, 2015 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 186 Report and Recommendations; granting 167 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 160 Motion to Quash. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 23, 2015. (mll)
March 13, 2015 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 174 Motion for Leave to File Response; denying 177 Motion to Strike; terminating 178 Motion to Clarify. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 13, 2015. (mll)
October 29, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 141 Motion for Order to Complete Independent Medical Examination. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 29, 2014. (mll)
July 15, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 99 Motion to Quash. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 15, 2014. (mll)
June 30, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 90 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 30, 2014. (mll)
February 20, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Motion to Quash. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 20, 2014. (mll)
February 7, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Marcus Vaden replacing Attorney John C. Riedel; granting 31 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Marcus Vaden replacing Attorney John C. Riedel; Attorney John C. Riedel terminated as counsel for Plaintiffs Keith Dedmon and Sean Kearney. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 7, 2014. (mll)
February 4, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying the deposition of Wanda Denise McCauley until further notice of this Court. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 4, 2014. (mll)
January 31, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys J. Carter Fairley and Robert L Henry, III terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 31, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Driver et al v. D. Mosley Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Driver
Represented By: John C. Riedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Driver
Represented By: John C. Riedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Dedmon
Represented By: John C. Riedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Kearney
Represented By: John C. Riedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Mosley Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon R. Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Dynamics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Millennium Building Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?