Walker v. Old Reliable Casualty Company

Plaintiff: James Walker
Defendant: Old Reliable Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2013cv04122
Filed: December 20, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 45 Notice/Stipulation for Dismissal filed by James Walker; ***Civil Case Dismissed with Prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 6, 2015. (cnn)
December 4, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion to Remand. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 4, 2014. (mll)
November 24, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 24, 2014. (mll)
April 21, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Stay. All proceedings, deadlines, and discovery in this case are stayed for 120 days. The parties are directed to update the Court on the status of this case every 30 days. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 21, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Old Reliable Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Reliable Casualty Company
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Walker
Represented By: George L McWilliams
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry
Represented By: Timothy J Myers
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: William B. Putman
Represented By: W H Taylor
Represented By: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III
Represented By: Stevan Earl Vowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?