Dennington v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al

Plaintiff: Jeff Dennington
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm General Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2014cv04001
Filed: January 2, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2016 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 152 Motion to Seal. Plaintiffs are directed to provide the Court with an unredacted copy of the motion and exhibits. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 4, 2016. (mll)
April 18, 2016 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 89 Motion to Compel. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 18, 2016. (mll)
March 30, 2016 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 113 Motion to Seal; granting 114 Motion to Redact Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude. The parties are directed to file their motions, briefs, and exhibits on the docket redacting all information that is the subject of the Protective Order. The parties are to provide the Court with an unredacted copy of the redacted filings. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 30, 2016. (See Order for specifics.) (mll)
March 14, 2016 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 14, 2016. (mll)
December 2, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 80 Motion to File Motion for Class Certification Under Seal. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 2, 2015. (mll)
April 2, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 2, 2015. (mll)
September 17, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 17, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennington v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Dennington
Represented By: Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: George L McWilliams
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: Jason Earnest Roselius
Represented By: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Joseph A. Cancila, Jr.
Represented By: Tal C. Chaiken
Represented By: Heidi Dalenberg
Represented By: Nick Kahlon
Represented By: John E. Moore
Represented By: Beverly A. Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph A. Cancila, Jr.
Represented By: Tal C. Chaiken
Represented By: Heidi Dalenberg
Represented By: Nick Kahlon
Represented By: John E. Moore
Represented By: Beverly A. Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?