Ortiz De Lizardi v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Maria Ortiz De Lizardi
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2014cv04005
Filed: January 6, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Hempstead
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $4,356.00 pursuant to the EAJA. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 16, 2014. (mll)
September 17, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT REVERSING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER AND REMANDING THIS CASE TO THE COMMISSIONER FOR FURTHER CONSIDERATION PURSUANT TO SENTENCE FOUR of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) as set forth in the 16 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 17, 2014. (mll)
May 2, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Brief filed by Maria Ortiz De Lizardi; (Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 6/5/2014). Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 2, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz De Lizardi v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Ortiz De Lizardi
Represented By: Matthew F. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?