Goodner et al v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Michael Goodner, Robbie Goodner, Henry Keener and Rosie Keener
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2014cv04013
Filed: January 10, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 14, 2016. (mll)
January 21, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion to Stay. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 21, 2016. (mll)
August 21, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing claims of Henry Keener and Rosie Keener against Shelter Mutual Insurance Company with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 21, 2015. (mll)
July 30, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to Stay. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 30, 2015. (mll)
March 16, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion to Stay. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 16, 2015. (mll)
December 15, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion to Stay. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 15, 2014. (mll)
December 10, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 10, 2014. (mll)
August 11, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Stay. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 11, 2014. (mll)
February 24, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Stay Pending Judicial Settlement Conference. All deadlines in this case are hereby stayed until 14 days after the conclusion of the settlement conference. The parties must submit a report to the Court every 30 days while the stay is in place. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 24, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodner et al v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Goodner
Represented By: Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: George L McWilliams
Represented By: Timothy J Myers
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: William B. Putman
Represented By: Jason Earnest Roselius
Represented By: W H Taylor
Represented By: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III
Represented By: Stevan Earl Vowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Goodner
Represented By: Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: George L McWilliams
Represented By: Timothy J Myers
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: William B. Putman
Represented By: Jason Earnest Roselius
Represented By: W H Taylor
Represented By: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III
Represented By: Stevan Earl Vowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Keener
Represented By: Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: George L McWilliams
Represented By: Timothy J Myers
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: William B. Putman
Represented By: Jason Earnest Roselius
Represented By: W H Taylor
Represented By: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III
Represented By: Stevan Earl Vowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Keener
Represented By: Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: George L McWilliams
Represented By: Timothy J Myers
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: William B. Putman
Represented By: Jason Earnest Roselius
Represented By: W H Taylor
Represented By: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III
Represented By: Stevan Earl Vowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Sarah E. Cullen
Represented By: John E. Moore
Represented By: Beverly A. Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?