Brown et al v. Homesite Group Incorporated

Plaintiff: Harlan Brown and Donna Brown
Defendant: Homesite Group Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2014cv04026
Filed: February 5, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT granting 57 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 58 Motion for Final Approval. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 27, 2017. (mll)
December 5, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion to Certify Class. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 5, 2016. (mll)
February 26, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. The parties have reached a settlement in this matter. The jury trial set for May 23, 2016 is cancelled. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 26, 2016. (mll)
September 3, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion to Stay. This action is stayed for a period of forty-five (45) days. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 3, 2015. (mll)
March 5, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Marshall S. Ney terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 5, 2015. (mll)
January 20, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. All claims arising after November 22, 2008 remain. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 20, 2015. (mll)
November 24, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 24, 2014. (mll)
June 30, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion for Protective Order; PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 30, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Homesite Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harlan Brown
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: Timothy J Myers
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: Richard E. Norman
Represented By: William B. Putman
Represented By: W H Taylor
Represented By: Stevan Earl Vowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Brown
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: Timothy J Myers
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: Richard E. Norman
Represented By: William B. Putman
Represented By: W H Taylor
Represented By: Stevan Earl Vowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homesite Group Incorporated
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?