Richard v. Tallant et al

Plaintiff: Louis Edward Richard
Defendant: Jana Tallant, Tara Green, Tammy Arnold, Shelby Miller, Misty, Shawn, Andre Jones, Dawanda Schwope and Brian Cook
Case Number: 4:2014cv04027
Filed: February 10, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Howard
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 78 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 21, 2016. (mll)
May 18, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. § 1983 claim against Jana Tallant. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 18, 2016. (mll)
March 4, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing issuance of subpoena for medical records of Correct Care Solutions. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 4, 2016. (mll)
March 3, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 51 Proposed Witness List filed by Louis Edward Richard. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 3, 2016. (mll)
February 1, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's official capacity claims and claim regarding diabetic snacks are dismissed. Plaintiff's claim regarding failure to provide insulin against Defendant Jana Tallant in her individual capacity remains. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 2, 2016. (mll) Modified signature date on 2/2/2016. (mll)
January 14, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion for Jury Trial. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 14, 2016. (mll)
October 21, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's request to add Dr. Patel as a Defendant re 9 Supplement filed by Louis Edward Richard. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 21, 2015. (mll)
February 2, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion for Jury Trial; denying 22 Motion to Withdraw Consent to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 2, 2015. (mll)
November 4, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Withdraw Notice of Insufficiency of Service; granting 20 Motion for Leave to File Answer out of Time. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 4, 2014. (mll)
May 7, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion to Supplement. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 7, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard v. Tallant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Edward Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Tallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawanda Schwope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?