Muhommad v. Hempstead County, Arkansas et al

Plaintiff: Michael Perry Muhommad
Defendant: Hempstead County, Arkansas, James Singleton, Johnny Godbolt, Lori Rook, B. Walker, P. Summerville, V. Mouldon and Randy Wright
Case Number: 4:2014cv04032
Filed: February 13, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Hempstead
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 53 ; granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims against Separate Defendants Sheriff James Singleton, B. Walker, P. Summerville, Sergeant V. Mouldon, and Hempstead County are dismissed. Plaintiff's claims against Separate Defendants Nurse Lori Rook and Johnny Godbolt for denial of medical care shall proceed. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 14, 2016. (mll)
January 15, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 15, 2016. (mll)
April 14, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 14, 2015. (mll)
June 12, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 8 Report and Recommendations. Judge Wright is dismissed from this lawsuit. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 12, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhommad v. Hempstead County, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hempstead County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Godbolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Rook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Summerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Mouldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Perry Muhommad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?