Walker v. TA Operating LLC

Plaintiff: John C. Walker
Defendant: TA Operating LLC
Case Number: 4:2014cv04055
Filed: April 7, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting 39 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 13, 2016. (mll)
October 27, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 27, 2015. (mll)
April 27, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Sanctions. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 27, 2015. (mll)
April 10, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 9, 2015. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. TA Operating LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Walker
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TA Operating LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?