Green v. American Modern Home Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Pamela Green
Defendant: American Modern Home Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2014cv04074
Filed: May 15, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Except for proceedings in furtherance of the Proposed Settlement, this action is stayed pending further order from the Court. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 28, 2017. (mll)
June 13, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 Motion to Seal. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 13, 2016. (mll)
March 30, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 54 Motion to Seal. Plaintiff is directed to file her redacted Reply on the docket and provide the Court with an unredacted copy of the Reply. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 30, 2016. (mll)
January 21, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion to Seal. Redacted Response is to be filed on the docket. An unredacted Response is to be provided to the Court. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 21, 2016. (mll)
September 1, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion to Seal. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 1, 2015. (mll)
November 24, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Joint Motion for Agreed Order Establishing Protocol for Production of Electronically Stored Information. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 24, 2014. (mll)
October 30, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER re 26 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 30, 2014. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. American Modern Home Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Green
Represented By: Kenneth (Casey) Castleberry
Represented By: Stephen C. Engstrom
Represented By: John C. Goodson
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: George L McWilliams
Represented By: Timothy J Myers
Represented By: Richard E Norman
Represented By: William B. Putman
Represented By: Jason Earnest Roselius
Represented By: W H Taylor
Represented By: A.F. (Tom) Thompson, III
Represented By: Stevan Earl Vowell
Represented By: R. Martin Weber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Modern Home Insurance Company
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Mark A. Johnson
Represented By: Andrew Evan Samuels
Represented By: Robert J. Tucker
Represented By: W. Kelvin Wyrick, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?