Johnson v. Walker

Plaintiff: Andrea Johnson
Defendant: John W. Walker, P.A.
Case Number: 4:2014cv04078
Filed: May 23, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Andrea Johnson against John W. Walker, P.A. Parties settled, case is dismissed pursuant to terms of settlement agreement. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 15, 2015. (mll)
June 10, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Defendant's Second Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 10, 2015. (mll)
May 4, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 1, 2015. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Johnson
Represented By: R. David Freeze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Walker, P.A.
Represented By: Robert L Henry, III
Represented By: Samuel Brent Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?