Arnold v. Tallant et al

Plaintiff: Bryan A. Arnold
Defendant: Jana Tallant and Butch Morris
Case Number: 4:2014cv04130
Filed: October 1, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Howard
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 33 ; granting 29 motion to dismiss; Case dismissed without prejudice; plaintiff failed to prosecute. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 14, 2016. (cnn)
October 6, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Canceling Summary Judgment Hearing scheduled for November 10, 2016. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 6, 2016. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service).(mll)
April 28, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff to provide Defendants with required responses to discovery requests by 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, May 19, 2016. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 28, 2016. (mll)
February 16, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion to Amend Complaint; granting 18 Motion to Supplement. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 16, 2016. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. Tallant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan A. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Tallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butch Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?