Juneau et al v. Jones et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Juneau and Tara Juneau
Defendant: Leo Jones and State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2014cv04165
Filed: December 30, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Miller
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' claims of bad faith and arbitrary/capricious claim handling are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 25, 2016. (mll)
January 21, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 21, 2016. (mll)
October 1, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion to Seal Document. Clerk is directed to place forthcoming exhibit under seal and grant applicable party access. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 30, 2015. (mll)
June 2, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss Party. Defendant Leo Jones Terminated. Plaintiffs' claims against Separate Defendant State Farm Automobile Insurance Company remain pending. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 2, 2015. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juneau et al v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Juneau
Represented By: Brian M. Caubarreaux
Represented By: Robert Lane Pittard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Juneau
Represented By: Brian M. Caubarreaux
Represented By: Robert Lane Pittard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Jones
Represented By: A. Gene Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?